Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 20:05:40 (UTC).

In the Matter of Meribeth Geauque Anderson

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 In the Matter of Meribeth Geauque Anderson was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

Sanchez, Alison E

Conservatee

Anderson, Meribeth Geauque

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

McConville, Theresa L.

Conservatee Attorneys

Rodgers, Richard A

Taylor, Daniel

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Description: Petition for Orders Pertaining to the Internal Affairs of a Trust; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Orders Pertaining to the Internal Affairs of a Trust; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion - Other (PRC); Description: Notice of Hearing and Motion to Quash Subpoena; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion - Other (PRC); Description: Notice of Hearing and Motion to Quash Subpoena; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Orders Pertaining to the Internal Affairs of a Trust; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance filed by Anderson, Meribeth Geauque on 07/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Petition for Orders Pertaining to the Internal Affairs of a Trust scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Hearing (PR) - Petition for Orders Pertaining to the Internal Affairs of a Trust scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (PRC) - Notice of Hearing and Motion to Quash Subpoena; Memorandum of Points and Authorities scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketAnderson, Meribeth Geauque added as a Objector effective 02/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgement of Receipt (Signed by Richard A Rodgers) filed by Sanchez, Alison E on 01/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCitation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service filed by Sanchez, Alison E on 01/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCitation issued on 12/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDuties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by Sanchez, Alison E on 12/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Sanchez, Alison E on 12/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information filed by Sanchez, Alison E on 12/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by Sanchez, Alison E on 12/14/2020. Filed By: Sanchez, Alison E(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: Anderson, Meribeth(Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Daniel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODGERS RICHARD A.