This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/22/2021 at 11:41:21 (UTC).

In The Matter of Mejia

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 In The Matter of Mejia was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mejia, Qurino Gerard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: OSC - Change of Name; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name filed by Mejia, Qurino Gerard on 02/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Published 12/23/20, 12/30/20, 1/06/21 and 1/13/21) filed by Mejia, Qurino Gerard on 01/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketOSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 02/05/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Mejia, Qurino Gerard on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mejia, Qurino Gerard on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Mejia, Qurino Gerard on 11/19/2020. Filed By: Mejia, Qurino Gerard(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less