This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 00:35:50 (UTC).

In The Matter of Mata

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 In The Matter of Mata was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Interested Parties

Garcia, Adriana Isabelle

Mata, Edith Torres

Garcia, Emma Melanie

Garcia, Ricardo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: OSC - Change of Name; Description: Matter of Mata; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name filed by Mata, Edith Torres on 01/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Petitioners Request to Change Namr of our Children) filed by Garcia, Ricardo on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketGarcia, Ricardo added as a Interested Party effective 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Publication (Order to show cause. Fillmore Gazette. Dates of service: 11/26/2020, 12/03, 12/10, & 12/17/2020) filed by Mata, Edith Torres; Garcia, Emma Melanie; Garcia, Ricardo; Garcia, Adriana Isabelle on 12/21/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (order to Show Cause. Served to Ricardo Garcia, father. Date of service: 12/9/2020) filed by Mata, Edith Torres; Garcia, Emma Melanie; Garcia, Ricardo; Garcia, Adriana Isabelle on 12/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted In Whole) filed by Mata, Edith Torres on 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketMata, Edith Torres Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Garcia, Adriana Isabelle; Garcia, Emma Melanie; Garcia, Ricardo; Mata, Edith Torres on 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOSC - Change of Name - Matter of Mata scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Mata, Edith Torres; Garcia, Adriana Isabelle; Garcia, Ricardo; Garcia, Emma Melanie on 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mata, Edith Torres; Garcia, Adriana Isabelle; Garcia, Ricardo; Garcia, Emma Melanie on 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Mata, Edith Torres; Garcia, Adriana Isabelle; Garcia, Ricardo; Garcia, Emma Melanie on 11/20/2020. Filed By: Garcia, Emma Melanie(Petitioner) | Garcia, Ricardo(Petitioner) | Garcia, Adriana Isabelle(Petitioner) | Mata, Edith Torres(Petitioner) Refers To: Garcia, Ricardo(Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less