This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 01:33:59 (UTC).

In the Matter of Lynne Rother

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 In the Matter of Lynne Rother was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

Rother, Lynne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

WALKER, MICHAEL G.

Other Attorneys

Taylor, Daniel

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 5/09/22; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition Other (PRC); Description: for Instructions Regarding Settlement Agreement; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 11/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPetition Other (PRC) - for Instructions Regarding Settlement Agreement scheduled for 01/04/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPetition - Other (for Instructions Regarding Settlement Agreement) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 11/08/2021. Filed By: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Conservator of Person and Estate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Description: For Instructions Regarding Mediation; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketOrder After Hearing (on the Petition for Instructions Regarding Mediation) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 10/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing Inventory and Appraisal and How to Object to the Inventory or the Appraised Value of Property filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 10/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Confidential Exparte/Temporary Conservatorship Information Summary) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator - scheduled for 04/02/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/18/2021. Filed By: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: Rother, Lynne(Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCitation issued on 03/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketConservatorship Preliminary/Interim Financial Declaration filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/08/2021. Filed By: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Conservator) Refers To: Rother, Lynne(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Daniel