This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 21:38:21 (UTC).

In the Matter of Louis Tennant

Case Summary

On 12/17/2014 In the Matter of Louis Tennant was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Administrator

Ventura County Public Administrator

Decedent

Tennant, Louis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

SMITH, LEROY

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2015
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. heard 01/22/2015 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • The Court appoints Ventura County Public Administrator as Administrator.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Affidavit of Publication filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 01/09/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Creditors Claim (In the amount of 3303.60) filed by American Express Centurion Bank on 01/02/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • American Express Centurion Bank added as a Claimant effective 01/02/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 12/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 01/22/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 12/17/2014. Filed By: Ventura County Public Administrator(Administrator) Refers To: Tennant, Louis(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.