Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 17:29:03 (UTC).

In The Matter of Leha Sean Hall

Case Summary

On 08/22/2014 In The Matter of Leha Sean Hall was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hall, Karen

Conservatee

Hall, Leha Sean

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservatee Attorney

SHEA, MARY C

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: General Plan/Care Plan; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: General Plan/Care Plan; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 11/03/17; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 11/04/15; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: General Plan/Care Plan; Description: Due 01/05/15; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) filed by Hall, Karen on 08/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Hall, Karen Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by Hall, Karen on 08/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 10/28/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Citation issued on 08/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Hall, Karen on 08/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Hall, Karen on 08/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by Hall, Karen on 08/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by Hall, Karen on 08/22/2014. Filed By: Hall, Karen(Petitioner) Refers To: Hall, Leha(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA, MARY C