Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:03 (UTC).

In the Matter of June Jones Living Trust

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 In the Matter of June Jones Living Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jones, Peter

Respondent

Jones, Hillary

Decedent

Jones, June

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bowne, Ryan D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition to Compel Trustee to Provide Information Regarding Trust Bank Accounts; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Miscellaneous Hearing (PR) - Petition to Compel Trustee to Provide Information Regarding Trust Bank Accounts scheduled for 08/21/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Jones, Peter on 08/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Request for Dismissal submitted by Jones, Peter rejected on 08/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • Request for Dismissal submitted by Jones, Peter rejected on 08/19/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Response filed by Jones, Hillary on 08/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Miscellaneous Hearing (PR) - Petition to Compel Trustee to Provide Information Regarding Trust Bank Accounts scheduled for 08/21/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Petition - Other (to Compel Trustee to Provide Information Regarding Trust Bank Accounts) filed by Jones, Peter on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Jones, Peter(Petitioner) Refers To: Jones, June(Decedent) | Jones, Hillary(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less