Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/16/2021 at 07:06:29 (UTC).

In the Matter of Joseph J. Wilkinson

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 In the Matter of Joseph J Wilkinson was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

Wilkinson, Joseph J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

WALKER, MICHAEL G.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 06/06/22; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory; Description: Due 09/07/21; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Description: Due 08/03/21; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketGose, Gregory R. appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Probate Conservator (Appointing The Ventura County Public Guardian Conservator of The Person And Estate, Bond Fixed At $1,000,000;) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 06/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketHearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report Due 06/06/22 is scheduled for 07/05/2022 at 10:30AM in Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketHearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory Due 09/07/21 is scheduled for 10/05/2021 at 10:30AM in Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketConfidential Investigator report finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCitation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 04/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 05/28/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCitation issued on 03/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketConservatorship Preliminary/Interim Financial Declaration filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/08/2021. Filed By: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Conservator) Refers To: Wilkinson, Joseph(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN is a litigant