This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/03/2022 at 00:24:51 (UTC).

In the Matter of Joaquin Caucu Samora

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 In the Matter of Joaquin Caucu Samora was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Decedent

Samora, Joaquin Caucu

Administrator

Samora, Jeffery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

JESSEE, MARK T

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Distribution (By Mark T Jessee) filed by Samora, Jeffery on 03/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Description: First and Final Report of Administration of Administrator and Petition for it's Settlement; Waiver o...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving (First and Final Report of Administration of Administrator and Petition for its Settlement, etc..) filed by Samora, Jeffery on 03/03/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition Other (PR) heard 03/03/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Escrow Final Settlement Statement for 3330 Taffrail Lane, Oxnard CA 93035, Supporting Declaration of Mark T. Jessee) filed by Samora, Jeffery on 03/02/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Samora, Jeffery on 02/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket40.00 received for 211-Request for Special Notice on 04/30/2021 from .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice filed by Brown, Fred on 04/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketBaskin, Robert M added as a effective 04/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketBrown, Fred added as a Interested Party effective 04/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketA Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated. 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Jeffery Samora Regarding Purported Last Will and Testament of Jaoquin Samora Dated 9/14/17) filed by Samora, Jeffery on 04/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Samora, Jeffery on 04/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Samora, Jeffery on 04/29/2021. Filed By: Samora, Jeffery(Administrator) Refers To: Samora, Joaquin(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JESSEE MARK T.