Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 14:15:50 (UTC).

In the Matter of Joan Lora Ware

Case Summary

On 06/02/2014 In the Matter of Joan Lora Ware was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

Bisk, Suzanne R

Conservatee

Ware, Joan Lora

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

Whitesides, Robert E

Conservatee Attorney

SHEA, MARY C

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 09/11/17; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 09/11/17; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Motion (PRC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Annual Status Report Due 09/09/15; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Care Plan Due 11/07/14; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2014
  • Capacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by Bisk, Suzanne R on 07/01/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Bisk, Suzanne R on 07/01/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Bisk, Suzanne R on 06/02/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Citation - Conservatorship (Issued and Endorsed) filed by Bisk, Suzanne R on 06/02/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Nomination (to Appoint Suzanne R Bisk as Conservator by Geraldine R Hansen) filed by Bisk, Suzanne R on 06/02/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Nomination (to Appoint Suzanne R Bisk as Conservator by Bonnie L Lutes) filed by Bisk, Suzanne R on 06/02/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator - Limited Conservatorship scheduled for 08/12/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by Bisk, Suzanne R on 06/02/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Limited Conservatorship) filed by Bisk, Suzanne R on 06/02/2014. Filed By: Bisk, Suzanne R(Limited Conservator of Person Only) Refers To: Ware, Joan(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA, MARY C