Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 01:05:13 (UTC).

In The Matter of Issac Johnson

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 In The Matter of Issac Johnson was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Conservator

VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

Johnson, Issac

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Clark, Maureen E.

Other Attorneys

Taylor, Daniel

SMITH, LEROY

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 11/22/21; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: RE: Confirmation of Transfer to San Diego County; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report scheduled on 01/04/22 is vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 11/22/21 scheduled for 01/04/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory; Description: Due 02/23/21; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Notice of Transferred Action to San Diego County and Declaration of Mailing) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 03/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase file contents transferred to receiving court San Diego pursuant to court order. Case transferred per Minute Order dated 02/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL on 08/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Confidential Ex Parte/ Temporary Conservatorship Information Summary) filed by COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL on 08/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Ex Parte Application For Good Cause Exception To Notice of Hearing on Petition For Appointment of Temporary Conservator of The Person) filed by COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL on 08/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator filed by COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL on 08/06/2020. Filed By: COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL(Petitioner) Refers To: Johnson, Issac(Conservatee) | VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCitation issued on 08/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information filed by COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL on 08/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL on 08/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL on 08/06/2020. Filed By: COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL(Petitioner) Refers To: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Conservator) | Johnson, Issac(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Daniel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, LEROY