Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:32 (UTC).

In the Matter of Irma Fraga Reyes

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 In the Matter of Irma Fraga Reyes was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Reyes, Irma Fraga

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: OSC - Change of Name; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Petition for Change of Name has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Decree Changing Name (Granted) filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 08/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Proof of Publication (Tri County Sentry July 4,11,18 & 25) filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Reyes, Irma Fraga Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 08/27/2014 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Petition for Change of Name filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Reyes, Irma Fraga(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less