This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 00:21:02 (UTC).

In the Matter of Guadalupe S Banuelos

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 In the Matter of Guadalupe S Banuelos was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Decedent

Banuelos, Guadalupe S

Administrator

Hernandez, Celine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

BAYLEY, GUY R

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Description: w/ Limited Authority; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (PR); Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Hernandez, Celine on 05/31/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Notice of Hearing, Notice of Motion, etc.. First Class Mail to List attached on 5/24/2022) filed by Hernandez, Celine on 05/24/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCitation - Probate (Issued) filed by Hernandez, Celine on 05/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket40.00 received for 211-Request for Special Notice on 05/20/2022 from .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice filed by Hernandez, Celine on 05/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Description: w/ Limited Authority; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. heard 04/07/2022 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - w/ Limited Authority scheduled for 05/19/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Unavailability) filed by Hernandez, Celine on 04/05/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Publication filed by Hernandez, Celine on 03/17/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING filed by Hernandez, Celine on 03/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate (for 04.07.22) filed by Hernandez, Celine on 02/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - w/ Limited Authority scheduled for 04/07/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with limited authority filed by Hernandez, Celine on 02/16/2022. Filed By: Hernandez, Celine(Proposed Administrator) Refers To: Banuelos, Guadalupe(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD