This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/21/2022 at 08:25:51 (UTC).

In the Matter of Gerard Vanee

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 In the Matter of Gerard Vanee was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Decedent

Vanee, Gerard

Administrator and Administrator With Will Annexed

Yimsara, Panutda

Interested Party

EE, KIM VAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator and Administrator With Will Annexed Attorney

Arrieta, Cristian Raul

Interested Party Attorney

BAYLEY, GUY R

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 04/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice to Creditors filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 02/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal (Final with attachments) filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 01/06/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketAllowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim (Allowed for $1,976.69) filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 01/04/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketAllowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim (Allowed for $5,974.28) filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 01/04/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCreditors Claim (in the amount of $5974.28, Claimant is AscensionPoint Recovery Services, LLC, on behalf of Citibank, N.A.) filed by AscensionPoint Recovery Services on 12/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCreditors Claim (In the Amount of $1976.69) filed by AscensionPoint Recovery Services on 12/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketAscensionPoint Recovery Services added as a Claimant effective 12/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Administration to Creditors filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 12/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketLetter issued on 11/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice filed by EE, KIM VAN on 10/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEE, KIM VAN added as a Interested Party effective 10/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Publication filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 10/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketA Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated. 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (for 10.28.21) filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 09/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 09/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Subscribing Witness filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 09/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - with Will Annexed scheduled for 10/28/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Yimsara, Panutda on 09/14/2021. Filed By: Yimsara, Panutda(Administrator With Will Annexed) Refers To: Vanee, Gerard(Decedent) | EE, KIM(Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD