Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 01:36:49 (UTC).

In the Matter of Eugenia V. Howard

Case Summary

On 07/11/2013 In the Matter of Eugenia filed a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit against Howard. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservators

Viets, Laura

Ventura County Public Guardian

Conservatee

Howard, Eugenia V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorneys

Rodriguez, Amber A

SMITH, LEROY

Conservatee Attorney

SHEA, MARY C

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Successor Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Successor Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Annual Status Report Due 03/25/15; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Description: Re: Account and Report for the Period of 03/25/14 - 03/24/15; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Inventory and Appraisal Due 06/16/14; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Level of Care Due 05/23/14; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2013
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Confidential Investigator report finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Citation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 07/25/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 07/11/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Citation - Conservatorship (Issued and Endorsed) filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 07/11/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator - Person and Estate scheduled for 09/10/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 07/11/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Capacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 07/11/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 07/11/2013. Filed By: Ventura County Public Guardian(Conservator) Refers To: Viets, Laura(Conservator of Person and Estate) | Howard, Eugenia(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA, MARY C