This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/11/2018 at 15:58:30 (UTC).

In the Matter of Ernest Kuhn

Case Summary

On 09/30/2009 In the Matter of Ernest Kuhn was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservatee

Kuhn, Ernest

Conservators

Shecter, Anita

Hardcastle, Sarah

Not Classified By Court

Poirier, Nancy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GODIN, RANDY

Conservatee Attorney

Wolter, Martha Jennifer

Other Attorneys

Kvale, Jeanne MacCalden

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
209 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2009
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by Hardcastle, Sarah on 09/30/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by Hardcastle, Sarah on 09/30/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • Declaration - Other (of Jeanne Kvale in Support of Ntc of Hearing on Ex Parte Petition for Order Appointing Temp Conservator) filed by Hardcastle, Sarah on 09/30/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator - Petition for Appt of Temporary Conservator of Person and Estate scheduled for 10/01/2009 at 01:30:00 PM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Hardcastle, Sarah on 09/30/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator - Petition for Appt of Temporary Conservator of Person and Estate scheduled for 10/01/2009 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator (of Person and Estate) filed by Hardcastle, Sarah on 09/30/2009. Filed By: Hardcastle, Sarah(Proposed Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator - Petition for Appt of Conservator of Person and Estate scheduled for 12/01/2009 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Person and Estate) filed by Hardcastle, Sarah on 09/30/2009. Filed By: Hardcastle, Sarah(Conservator) Refers To: Poirier, Nancy(Objector) | Kuhn, Ernest(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KVALE JEANNE MACCALDEN