Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/19/2021 at 07:08:53 (UTC).

In The Matter of Emiliano Angel Gomez

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 In The Matter of Emiliano Angel Gomez was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

Gomez, Emiliano Angel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

WALKER, MICHAEL G.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Filing Order) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 06/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketLetter issued on 06/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketLetters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship (Issued To Ventura Public Guardian, Expires 07.09.21) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 06/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Temporary Guardian or Conservator (Ventura County Public Guardian Appointed as Temporary Conservator of Person & Estate, Bond Fixed at $1,000,000.00 Expires 07/09/21) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 05/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketConfidential Investigator report finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/04/2021. Filed By: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: Gomez, Emiliano(Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketConservatorship Preliminary/Interim Financial Declaration filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Due Diligence and Request For Order Dispensing With Notice) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Confidential Ex Parte/ Temporary Conservatorship Information Summary) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation issued on 03/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 03/04/2021. Filed By: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: Gomez, Emiliano(Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER, MICHAEL G.