Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:33:19 (UTC).

In the Matter of Eliot Alexander Ramsey

Case Summary

On 07/07/2014 In the Matter of Eliot Alexander Ramsey was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservators

Assaf, Marisa

Ramsey, Jeff

Conservatee

Ramsey, Eliot Alexander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

Smith, Andrew D

Conservatee Attorney

SHEA, MARY C

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Co-Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Co-Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: due 09/15/17; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: due 09/15/17; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Motion (PRC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:05 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Annual Status Report Due 09/16/15; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Level of Care Due 11/14/14; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2014
  • Citation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service filed by Assaf, Marisa; Ramsey, Jeff on 07/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Citation - Conservatorship (Original Issued and Endorsed Copy Filed.) filed by Assaf, Marisa; Ramsey, Jeff on 07/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form (For Marisa Assaf) filed by Assaf, Marisa; Ramsey, Jeff on 07/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form (For Jeff Ramsey) filed by Assaf, Marisa; Ramsey, Jeff on 07/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Confirmation of Viewing Conservatorship Video filed by Assaf, Marisa; Ramsey, Jeff on 07/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Co-Conservator - scheduled for 09/16/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Citation issued on 07/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by Ramsey, Jeff; Assaf, Marisa on 07/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Co-Conservators filed by Ramsey, Jeff; Assaf, Marisa on 07/07/2014. Filed By: Ramsey, Jeff(Limited Conservator of Person Only) | Assaf, Marisa(Limited Conservator of Person Only) Refers To: Ramsey, Eliot(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA, MARY C