This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/12/2018 at 13:53:51 (UTC).

In the Matter of Ebrahim Yazdi

Case Summary

On 01/31/2011 In the Matter of Ebrahim Yazdi was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

Ventura County Public Guardian

Conservatee

Yazdi, Ebrahim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

SMITH, LEROY

Conservatee Attorney

SHEA, MARY

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisement and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisement and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisement and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisement and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Description: Re: Final Account and Report; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Biennial Status Report Due 03/28/14; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • Past Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: Re: Annual Status Report (due 03/29/12); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2011
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship (02/08/2011 Hearing) filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 01/31/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • Citation - Conservatorship (Issued and Endorsed) filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 01/31/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator - scheduled for 02/08/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator (Conservator of Person and Estate) filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 01/31/2011. Filed By: Ventura County Public Guardian(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: Yazdi, Ebrahim(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 03/29/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • Citation issued on 01/31/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 01/31/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • Capacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 01/31/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by Ventura County Public Guardian on 01/31/2011. Filed By: Ventura County Public Guardian(Conservator) Refers To: Yazdi, Ebrahim(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, LEROY