Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 07:11:56 (UTC).

In the Matter of E David Migocki

Case Summary

On 04/03/2012 In the Matter of E David Migocki was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Executor

Rabourn, Vickie

Decedent

Migocki, E David

Administrator With Will Annexed

Kabel, Betty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

Staker, Kevin G.

Administrator With Will Annexed Attorney

Arrieta, Cristian Raul

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2012
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Rabourn, Vickie on 04/30/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Affidavit of Publication re: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Rabourn, Vickie on 04/20/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Rabourn, Vickie on 04/12/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Request for Special Notice (On all Matters) filed by Kabel, Betty on 04/09/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Lang, H Miles added as a effective 04/09/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Rabourn, Vickie on 04/06/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated. 04/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 05/09/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Rabourn, Vickie on 04/03/2012. Filed By: Rabourn, Vickie(Executor) Refers To: Migocki, E(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arrieta, Cristian Raul