Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 05:03:36 (UTC).

In The Matter of Donald Floyd Woronow

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 In The Matter of Donald Floyd Woronow was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Administrator

VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

Decedent

Woronow, Donald Floyd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

SMITH, LEROY

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 01/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 01/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal (Final With Attachment 1 & 2) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order (Notice of Filing of Order) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 11/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketLetter issued on 10/28/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketLetters (Issued To Ventura Public Administrator) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 10/28/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketGose, Gregory R. appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketOrder for Probate (Ventura County Public Administrator Appointed as Administrator. $1,000,000 Bond on File. Gregory Gose Appointed as Probate Referee) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 10/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. heard 10/22/2020 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketThe Court appoints Ventura County Public Guardian as Administrator.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Publication filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 10/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Publication filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 10/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 09/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 10/22/2020 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 08/27/2020. Filed By: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR(Administrator) Refers To: Woronow, Donald(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, LEROY