This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 06:48:15 (UTC).

In the Matter of Donald D. Paillette 1995 Trust

Case Summary

On 03/23/2012 In the Matter of Donald D Paillette 1995 Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Reynolds, Denise

Defendant

Donald D. Paillette 1995 Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ONSTOT, W. STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Past Events - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Apccepting Declination of Successor Trustee and for Appt of Successor Trustee; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing (PR) heard 04/25/2012 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Notice - Other (of Dismissal of Petition) filed by Reynolds, Denise on 04/24/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • Miscellaneous (First Supplement to Petition for Order Accepting Declination of Successor Trustee and for Appointment of Successor Trustee) filed by Reynolds, Denise on 03/28/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Reynolds, Denise on 03/28/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • Miscellaneous Hearing (PR) - Petition for Order Apccepting Declination of Successor Trustee and for Appt of Successor Trustee scheduled for 04/25/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • Petition - Other (for Order Accepting Declination of Successor Trustee and for Appt of Successor Trustee) filed by Reynolds, Denise on 03/23/2012. Filed By: Reynolds, Denise(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Onstot, W Stephen