Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:28 (UTC).

In The Matter of Dollie Hall

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 In The Matter of Dollie Hall was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Administrators

Hall, Cassandra

Hall, David

Decedent

Hall, Dollie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Baskin, Robert M

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Description: Petition for Settlement and Final distribution and for Allowance of Compensation for Statutory Servi...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2014
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. heard 08/07/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 09/03/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • Affidavit of Publication filed by Hall, David on 07/18/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • Nomination (of Administration by Arthur B Hall Jr) filed by Hall, David on 07/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Hall, David on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Hall, David on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 08/07/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Hall, David on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Hall, David(Administrator) | Hall, Cassandra(Proposed Administrator) Refers To: Hall, Dollie(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baskin, Robert M