This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 01:04:37 (UTC).

In the Matter of Dillon

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 In the Matter of Dillon was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The People of the State of California

Respondent

Dillon, Cody Montana

Interested Party

Department of Justice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'Brien, Kathleen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Status Conference RE: Weapons Cases; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Release from Firearm Prohibition / Hearing for Relief from Firearm Prohibition; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPetition for Release from Firearm Prohibition / Hearing for Relief from Firearm Prohibition - scheduled for 01/24/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference RE: Weapons Cases - scheduled for 01/24/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Status Conference RE: Weapons Cases; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference RE: Weapons Cases - scheduled for 01/24/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Release from Firearm Prohibition / Hearing for Relief from Firearm Prohibition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Status Conference RE: Weapons Cases; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPetition for Release from Firearm Prohibition / Hearing for Relief from Firearm Prohibition - scheduled for 01/24/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference RE: Weapons Cases - scheduled for 01/10/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference RE: Weapons Cases - scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPetition for Release from Firearm Prohibition / Hearing for Relief from Firearm Prohibition - scheduled for 12/27/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 27.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Hearing for Relief from Firearms Prohibition Welfare & Institutions Code 8103 f 5 filed by Dillon, Cody Montana on 10/28/2021. Filed By: Dillon, Cody Montana(Respondent) Refers To: Department of Justice(Interested Party) | The People of the State of California(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Justice is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Brien, Kathleen