This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/09/2019 at 00:18:04 (UTC).

In The Matter of Dawn Butcher

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 In The Matter of Dawn Butcher was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

Dompier, Deborah

Conservators

Timm, Robin L

Timm, Steve

Dompier, Deborah

Friend, Angelique

Ryan, Bonnie P

Conservatee

Butcher, Dawn E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservator Attorneys

Fortunati, Christopher A

CAPRITTO, MARIA

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Co-Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Co-Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2017
  • Petition for Appointment of Co-Conservator - scheduled for 11/03/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Pursuant to Probate Code Section 811) filed by Timm, Robin L; Timm, Steve on 09/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Citation - Conservatorship (Issued and Endorsed) filed by Timm, Robin L; Timm, Steve on 09/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Timm, Steve on 09/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Timm, Robin L on 09/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Citation issued on 09/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by Timm, Robn L; Timm, Steve on 09/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by Timm, Robn L; Timm, Steve on 09/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Co-Conservators filed by Timm, Robn L; Timm, Steve on 09/11/2017. Filed By: Timm, Steve(Proposed Conservator) | Timm, Robin L(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: Butcher, Dawn(Proposed Conservatee) | Ryan, Bonnie(Successor Conservator of Estate Only)

    Read MoreRead Less