Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/11/2021 at 05:22:14 (UTC).

In The Matter of Daniel William Janssen

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 In The Matter of Daniel William Janssen was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Decedent

Janssen, Daniel William

Administrator and Administrator With Will Annexed

VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator and Administrator With Will Annexed Attorney

SMITH, LEROY

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Satisfaction and Release of Claim) filed by Los Robles Hosptial And Medical Center on 03/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCreditors Claim ($1,484.75) filed by Los Robles Hosptial And Medical Center on 02/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketLos Robles Hosptial And Medical Center added as a Claimant effective 02/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Filing of Order) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 01/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketLetter issued on 12/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketLetters (Issued To Ventura Public Administrator) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 12/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketGose, Gregory R. appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A.; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A. heard 10/22/2020 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A. - scheduled for 12/03/2020 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Publication filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 10/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 09/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketWill Deposit (D64032) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 08/27/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A. - scheduled for 10/22/2020 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR on 08/27/2020. Filed By: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR(Administrator With Will Annexed) Refers To: Janssen, Daniel(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, LEROY