This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 04:21:24 (UTC).

In the Matter of Dalicia Erika Macias

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 In the Matter of Dalicia Erika Macias was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Minor

Macias, Dalicia Erika

Guardian Ad Litem

Macias, Maria Alicia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

BAYLEY, GUY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Status Review (Guardianship) to Confirm Receipt of Confidential Guardianship Status Report; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketLetter issued on 10/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketLetters of Guardianship (Issued to Maria Alicia Macias) filed by Macias, Maria Alicia on 10/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDuties of Guardian filed by Macias, Maria Alicia on 10/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor(s) has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian of Minor (Maria Alicia Macias is appointed Guardian of the Person) filed by Macias, Maria Alicia on 10/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketStatus Review (Guardianship) to Confirm Receipt of Confidential Guardianship Status Report is scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 08:35 AM in Department J1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketThe Court appoints Maria Alicia Macias as guardian. Letters to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketStatus Review (Guardianship) to Confirm Receipt of Confidential Guardianship Status Report - scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 08:35:00 AM in J1 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - scheduled for 10/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in J1 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted in Whole Including Court Investigator Fees) filed by Macias, Maria Alicia on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMacias, Maria Alicia Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Macias, Maria Alicia on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketInformation Release Authorization filed by Macias, Maria Alicia on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by Macias, Maria Alicia on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketGuardianship Questionnaire filed by Macias, Maria Alicia on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketConfidential Guardian Screening Form filed by Macias, Maria Alicia on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor(s) filed by Macias, Maria Alicia on 08/23/2021. Filed By: Macias, Maria Alicia(Guardian) Refers To: Macias, Dalicia(Minor)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD