Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 00:52:06 (UTC).

In The Matter of Cristofer Lopez-Lopez

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 In The Matter of Cristofer Lopez-Lopez was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

Lopez-Lopez, Cristofer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

SMITH, LEROY

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 11/22/21; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory; Description: Due 02/23/21; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory; Description: Due 02/23/21; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketHearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory - Due 02/23/21 scheduled for 02/23/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of filing Confidential Determination of Conservatee's Appropriate Level of Care) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 02/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing Inventory and Appraisal and How to Object to the Inventory or the Appraised Value of Property filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 02/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 01/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketConfidential Investigator report finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCitation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 10/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 09/18/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 11/20/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCitation issued on 09/08/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 09/03/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 09/03/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN on 09/03/2020. Filed By: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Conservator) Refers To: Lopez-Lopez, Cristofer(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, LEROY