Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 08:01:14 (UTC).

In the Matter of Clifford W. Maddox

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 In the Matter of Clifford W Maddox was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Administrator

Ventura County Public Administrator

Decedent

Maddox, Clifford W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

Barnes, Jeffrey E

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/20/2021 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketStatus Report (And Request to Withdraw Petition To Administer Estate) filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 05/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 05/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 04/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 05/20/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 05/20/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 03/30/2021. Filed By: Ventura County Public Administrator(Proposed Administrator) Refers To: Maddox, Clifford(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barnes, Jeffrey E