This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/12/2018 at 01:07:42 (UTC).

In the Matter of Clara Sirkin

Case Summary

On 04/22/2010 In the Matter of Clara Sirkin was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Executor

Sirkin, Jeffrey

Decedent

Sirkin, Clara

Not Classified By Court

Sirkin, Myra

Sirkin, Gary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

BERESKY, TIMOTHY J.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

TARDIFF, MARY ANN

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2010
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary heard 05/26/2010 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • Affidavit of Publication filed by Sirkin, Jeffrey on 05/24/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated. 04/22/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs (Granted in Whole) filed by Sirkin, Jeffrey on 04/22/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Sirkin, Jeffrey Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Sirkin, Jeffrey on 04/22/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary - Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary scheduled for 05/26/2010 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary filed by Sirkin, Jeffrey on 04/22/2010. Filed By: Sirkin, Jeffrey(Executor) Refers To: Sirkin, Clara(Decedent) | Sirkin, Gary(Objector) | Sirkin, Myra(Objector)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TARDIFF, MARY ANN