Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:13:43 (UTC).

In the Matter of Carol Juanita Griffis

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 In the Matter of Carol Juanita Griffis was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES

Conservatee

Griffis, Carol Juanita

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: Re: Update/Status Report (PD Appointment); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: Re: Update/Status Report (PD Appointment); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 06/07/17; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Motion (PRC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 3:13 PM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: for Filing/Sufficiency of Biennial Status Report; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Motion (PRC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 4:31 PM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2014
  • Report - Other (Annual or Biennial Review Investigators Report to Court) filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Order Appointing (Court Investigator) filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Letters of Guardianship (Issued to the Director of Health of the State of California) filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Order Appointing Guardian of Minor (Order Appointing Guardian of the Person) filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration of Advice Given) filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Affidavit - Other (Affidavit of Inability to Attend Hearing) filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Order Appointing Counsel (Sidney Young for with the Department of Health) filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Citation issued on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES on 06/27/2014. Filed By: DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: Griffis, Carol(Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less