Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 23:13:32 (UTC).

In the Matter of Carlo Lingiardi

Case Summary

On 05/08/2013 In the Matter of Carlo Lingiardi was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

Nelson, Tiffany

Conservatee

Lingiardi, Carlo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

CAPRITTO, MARIA

Conservatee Attorney

SHEA, MARY C

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (PRC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (PRC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 10/20/16; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Description: ReAccount and Report for the Period of 10/22/14 - 10/21/16; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2013
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed by Nelson, Tiffany on 06/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Citation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service filed by Nelson, Tiffany on 06/11/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by Nelson, Tiffany on 05/08/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 07/23/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Citation issued on 05/08/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Nelson, Tiffany on 05/08/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by Nelson, Tiffany on 05/08/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Capacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by Nelson, Tiffany on 05/08/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by Nelson, Tiffany on 05/08/2013. Filed By: Nelson, Tiffany(Conservator) Refers To: Lingiardi, Carlo(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA, MARY C