This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 11:37:48 (UTC).

In The Matter of Brenda Joyce Contreraz

Case Summary

On 07/11/2012 In The Matter of Brenda Joyce Contreraz was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Contreraz Valverde, Stephani Angela

Defendant

Brenda Joyce Contreraz

Decedent

Contreraz, Brenda Joyce

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ONSTOT, W. STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property (Estates $100,000 or Less) has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Order Determining Succession to Real Property filed by Contreraz Valverde, Stephani Angela on 08/08/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Minutes finalized for Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property heard 08/08/2012 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Contreraz Valverde, Stephani Angela on 07/13/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property - scheduled for 08/08/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property (Estates $100,000 or Less) filed by Contreraz Valverde, Stephani Angela on 07/11/2012. Filed By: Contreraz Valverde, Stephani Angela(Petitioner) Refers To: Contreraz, Brenda(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Onstot, W Stephen