Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:06 (UTC).

In the Matter of Beryl D. Peterson

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 In the Matter of Beryl D Peterson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Executors

Kennedy, Susan E.

Peterson, John D.

Decedent

Peterson, Beryl D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

Trainotti, D Michael

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution; Description: First and Final Report of Executor of Account, Waiver of Accounting, Petition for Final Discharge, f...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution; Description: First and Final Report of Executor of Account, Waiver of Accounting, Petition for Final Discharge, f...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • Receipt of Distribution (By Susan E Kennedy) filed by Kennedy, Susan E.; Peterson, John D. on 06/23/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • Receipt of Distribution (By John D Peterson) filed by Kennedy, Susan E.; Peterson, John D. on 06/23/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Order Approving (First and Final Report of Executor or Account; Waiver of Accounting; Petition for Final Distribution, for Statutory Attorney's Fees, and for Discharge.) filed by Peterson, John D.; Kennedy, Susan E. on 06/12/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2014
  • Order for Probate received and forwarded to Judge Reiser.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. heard 08/07/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • The Court appoints John D. Peterson and Susan E. Kennedy as Co-Executor(s).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Will admitted to probate on 08/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Affidavit of Publication filed by Peterson, John D.; Kennedy, Susan E. on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Kennedy, Susan E.; Peterson, John D. on 07/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 08/07/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Peterson, John D.; Kennedy, Susan E. on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Peterson, John D.(Executor) | Kennedy, Susan E.(Executor) Refers To: Peterson, Beryl(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less