This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/19/2023 at 16:00:18 (UTC).

In the Matter of Ashley Partain

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 In the Matter of Ashley Partain was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura County Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Administrator

Duval, Veronica

Decedent

Partain, Ashley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

LEBOWSKY, LAWRENCE M.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketLetter issued on 02/03/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketLetters (of Administration Appointed to Veronica Duval as Administrator with Limited Authority) filed by Duval, Veronica on 02/03/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with limited authority has been Granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder for Probate (Veronica Duval as Administrator with Limited Authority, 0 Bond, Richard Tentler as Probate Referee) filed by Duval, Veronica on 01/12/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketTentler, Richard W. appointed as Probate Referee .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. heard 01/12/2023 10:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe Court appoints Veronica Duval as Administrator.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Duval, Veronica on 01/10/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
999 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less