This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 05:27:16 (UTC).

In The Matter of Arthur Paul Mencher

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 In The Matter of Arthur Paul Mencher was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Executor

Mencher, Klara K

Decedent

Mencher, Arthur Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

JESSEE, MARK T

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Account and Report (PR); Description: First And Final Report of Administration of Executor And Petition For Its Settlement; Waiver of Acco...; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Mencher, Klara K on 01/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketreceived for 202 - Subsequent papers - petitions, objections or other papers in opposition on 01/11/2021. Filed By: Mencher, Klara K(Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketAccount and Report (PR) - First And Final Report of Administration of Executor And Petition For Its Settlement; Waiver of Accounting; For Allowance of Statutory Attorneys Fees; And For Final Distribution scheduled for 02/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketPetition on Final Account (First And Final Report of Administration of Executor And Petition For Its Settlement; Waiver of Accounting; For Allowance of Statutory Attorneys Fees; And For Final Distribution) filed by Mencher, Klara K on 01/08/2021. Filed By: Mencher, Klara K(Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal (Final with attachment 1) filed by Mencher, Klara K on 11/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Other (Of Estate Administration) filed by Mencher, Klara K on 11/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Proof of Notice of Estate Administration) filed by Mencher, Klara K on 11/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketLetter issued on 07/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketLetters (letters Issued to Klara K. Mencher as Executor with Full Authority) filed by Mencher, Klara K on 07/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 04/23/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication filed by Mencher, Klara K on 03/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Mencher, Klara K on 03/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Mencher, Klara K on 02/21/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Mencher, Klara K on 02/21/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketWill Deposit (D36092 & C63093) filed by Mencher, Klara K on 02/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 03/18/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Mencher, Klara K on 02/07/2020. Filed By: Mencher, Klara K(Executor) Refers To: Mencher, Arthur(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JESSEE MARK T.