Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 02:04:36 (UTC).

In the Matter of Anne S McFee

Case Summary

On 07/24/2013 In the Matter of Anne S McFee was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservators

McFee, Mary

Resnick, Kathleen

McFee, John III

Conservatee

McFee, Anne S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorneys

Renshaw, Steven J.

FEDER, STEVEN S

KVALE, JEANNE MACCALDEN

Other Attorneys

Lenehan, William

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference Conship; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference Conship; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (PRC); Description: Re: Change of Venue; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Annual Status Report Due 10/08/14; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Description: Re: Account and Report for the Temporary Period of 08/06/13-10/07/13 and Appointment Starting 10/08/...; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Motion (PRC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 3:30 PM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2013
  • Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by McFee, Anne S on 07/24/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by MdFee, Mary on 07/24/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Confirmation of Viewing Conservatorship Video filed by MdFee, Mary on 07/24/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by MdFee, Mary on 07/24/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of person and Estate filed by MdFee, Mary on 07/24/2013. Filed By: McFee, Mary(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: McFee, Anne(Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Citation issued on 07/24/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form filed by MdFee, Mary on 07/24/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by MdFee, Mary on 07/24/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by MdFee, Mary on 07/24/2013. Filed By: McFee, Mary(Conservator) Refers To: McFee, Anne(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lenehan, William