Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 08:46:33 (UTC).

In The Matter of Andrew Scott Miller

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 In The Matter of Andrew Scott Miller was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

Miller, Patrick L

Conservatee

Miller, Andrew Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

McNulty, Dennis P

Other Attorneys

Taylor, Daniel

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 05/31/22; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Description: Due 07/27/21; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Probate Conservator (Appointing Patrick L. Miller Limited Conservator of The Person Only, No Bond Required) filed by Miller, Patrick L on 05/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketHearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report Due 05/31/22 is scheduled for 06/28/2022 at 09:00AM in Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketHearing Re: Care Plan Due 07/27/21 is scheduled for 08/31/2021 at 09:00AM in Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketThe Court appoints Patrick L Miller as conservator. Letters to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketHearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 05/31/22 scheduled for 06/28/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed by Miller, Patrick L on 02/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - scheduled for 04/23/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCitation - Conservatorship (Issued And Endorsed) filed by Miller, Patrick L on 01/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketConfirmation of Viewing Conservatorship Video filed by Miller, Patrick L on 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDuties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by Miller, Patrick L on 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketConfidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Miller, Patrick L on 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information filed by Miller, Patrick L on 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by Miller, Patrick L on 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by Miller, Patrick L on 02/01/2021. Filed By: Miller, Patrick L(Conservator) Refers To: Miller, Andrew(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Daniel