This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:18:58 (UTC).

In the Matter of 6137 Grimes Canyon Road

Case Summary

On 11/08/2016 In the Matter of 6137 Grimes Canyon Road was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Quality Loan Service Corp

Interested Parties

Newbury Business Park LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Hall, Virginia

Chase Manhattan Bank USA NA

County of Ventura

Hall, Virginia C

FIA Card Services NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robbins Coutts, Melissa

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Hearing; Description: Re Status of Distribution of Funds; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Hearing; Description: Re Status of Distribution of Funds; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Hearing; Description: Re Status of Distribution of Funds; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Status Hearing - Re Status of Distribution of Funds scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2016
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Mail Returned Undeliverable (Order to Deposit Surplus Funds, Return to Sender, Not deliverable as addressed, Unable to forward) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 12/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Status Hearing - Re Status of Distribution of Funds scheduled for 01/30/2017 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Order to Deposit Surplus Funds Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Code 2924j(c) & (d) and Schedule Further Proceedings; Proof of Service, filed December 1, 2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Miscellaneous (County of Venturas Claim for Undistributed Surplus Proceeds from Trustees Sale; Memo of Ps&As Declaration of Jim Delperdang) filed by County of Ventura on 11/29/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Notice - Other (of case assignment) filed by Quality Loan Service Corp on 11/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Notice - Other (Of Petition of Trustee Quality Loan Service Corp to Deposit Surplus Funds Pursuant to Civil Code 2924j(c) & (d)) filed by Quality Loan Service Corp on 11/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Quality Loan Service Corp on 11/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposits of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale filed by Quality Loan Service Corp on 11/08/2016. Filed By: Quality Loan Service Corp(Petitioner) Refers To: Hall, Virginia(Interested Party) | Hall, Virginia(Interested Party) | Hall, Virginia(Interested Party) | Hall, Virginia(Interested Party) | Chase Manhattan Bank USA NA(Interested Party) | Chase Manhattan Bank USA NA(Interested Party) | Chase Manhattan Bank USA NA(Interested Party) | County of Ventura(Interested Party) | Newbury Business Park LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company(Interested Party) | FIA Card Services NA(Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fia Card Services, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COUNTS MELISSA ROBBINS ESQ.