This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/31/2020 at 18:37:30 (UTC).

In re the Van Valkenburgh Family Trust Dated 7/2/1999, etc

Case Summary

On 05/10/2016 In re the Van Valkenburgh Family Trust Dated 7/2/1999, etc was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura County Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Van Valkenburgh, John Kimball Kim

Respondent

West, Catherine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COHEN, JEFFREY S.

Respondent Attorney

SAMINI, DABAK

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (PR); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (PR); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (PR); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference PR; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Re: POST DISCOVERY TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court Trial (PR); Description: RE: TRIAL CALL 2-3 EST; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial (PR) - RE: TRIAL CALL 2-3 EST scheduled for 09/04/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Hearing (PR) - Re: POST DISCOVERY TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE scheduled for 09/04/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Van Valkenburgh, John Kimball Kim on 08/22/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court Trial (PR); Description: RE: TRIAL CALL 2-3 EST; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Re: POST DISCOVERY TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Former Attorney Jeffrey S. Cohen, Now Self Represented) filed by Van Valkenburgh, John Kimball Kim on 05/22/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Description: Petition to Compel Accounting and Objection to Informal Trust Accounting of the Van Valkenburgh Fami...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition - Other (PR) heard 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketPetition - Other (PR) - Petition to Compel Accounting and Objection to Informal Trust Accounting of the Van Valkenburgh Family Trust, etc scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition - Other (PR) set on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Non Service) filed by Van Valkenburgh, John Kimball Kim on 07/08/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Non Service) filed by Van Valkenburgh, John Kimball Kim on 07/08/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Non Service) filed by Van Valkenburgh, John Kimball Kim on 05/20/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketMiscellaneous Hearing (PR) - Petition to Compel Accounting and Objection to Informal Trust Accounting of the Van Valkenburgh Family Trust, etc scheduled for 08/10/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketPetition - Other (Petition to Compel Accounting and Objection to Informal Trust Accounting of the Van Valkenburgh Family Trust, etc) filed by Van Valkenburgh, John Kimball Kim on 05/10/2016. Filed By: Van Valkenburgh, John Kimball Kim(Petitioner) Refers To: West, Catherine(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less