This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/23/2019 at 05:03:54 (UTC).

In Re: The Pieszak Revocable Trust, Dtd. August 6, 1996

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 In Re The Pieszak Revocable Trust, Dtd August 6, 1996 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

Sanders, Judith M.

Galindo, Anita M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Van Dyke, Keith

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketResponse (Responses and Objections to Petition Under Probate Code 850) filed by Pieszak, Dr. Caroline C. on 09/25/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketPieszak, Dr. Caroline C. added as a Respondent effective 09/25/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgement of Receipt (re Petition to Determine Ownership signed by Kira Masteller atty for Caroline C. Pieszak on 8-27-18) filed by Galindo, Anita M.; Sanders, Judith M. on 09/07/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (9-26-18) filed by Galindo, Anita M.; Sanders, Judith M. on 08/17/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Endorsed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketPetition Other (PR) - Petition To Determine Ownership of Real Property, to Cancel Deed to Real Property; Petition to Determine or Appoint Trustee scheduled for 09/26/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by Galindo, Anita M.; Sanders, Judith M. on 08/14/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketPetition - Other (Petition To Determine Ownership of Real Property, to Cancel Deed to Real Property; Petition to Determine or Appoint Trustee) filed by Galindo, Anita M.; Sanders, Judith M. on 08/14/2018. Filed By: Sanders, Judith M.(Petitioner) | Galindo, Anita M.(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Van Dyke, Keith