This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 20:07:37 (UTC).

In Re The Brett Yarmie 2010 Revocable Living Trust

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 In Re The Brett Yarmie 2010 Revocable Living Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Goldstein, James

Riggio, Dino

Loebl, Jeffrey

Defendant

The Brett Yarmie 2010 Revocable Living Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

SIGELMAN, PAUL

Malin, Garry S

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (PR); Event Time: 10:24 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Review Hearing (PR); Description: RE: Progress on Asset Collection; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Account and Report (PR); Description: RE: Account & Report for the period of date of Settlor's Death through 09/15/21 due 12/15/21; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Loebl, Jeffrey on 11/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketObjection (to Proposed Order and Request to Withhold the Proposed Order Pending Resolution of DMV and Tax Consequeces by Stipulated order Under Discussion Between Counsel) filed by Goldstein, James on 11/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Ex Parte; Description: for OSC re: Contempt; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Exparte Petition for Order to Show Cause as to Why James Goldstein Should Not be Punished for Contempt) filed by Loebl, Jeffrey on 10/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/27/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEx-parte application for OSC RE: Contempt requested by Jeffrey Loebl is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketReview Hearing (PR) - RE: Progress on Asset Collection scheduled for 01/19/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketFax Request for Continuance and Order (GRANTED) filed by Goldstein, James on 08/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (09/01/21) filed by Riggio, Dino on 07/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (09/08/21) filed by Goldstein, James on 07/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPetition - Other (for Instruction and Information and Accounting; Attorney's Fees and Costs; and Damages) filed by Riggio, Dino on 07/21/2021. Filed By: Riggio, Dino(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPetition Other (PR) - Petition For Construction of Trust Instrument Appointment of Trustee scheduled for 09/08/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support (Supporting Declaration of James Goldstein) filed by Goldstein, James on 07/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCitation - Probate (Summons Issued and Endorsed) filed by Goldstein, James on 07/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (Petitioner's Request For Judicial Notice) filed by Goldstein, James on 07/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketPetition - Other (Petition For Construction of Trust Instrument Appointment of Trustee) filed by Goldstein, James on 07/20/2021. Filed By: Goldstein, James(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIGELMAN, PAUL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malin, Garry S