Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:34 (UTC).

In Re The Barbara Baxter Trust dtd May 22, 2002

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 In Re The Barbara Baxter Trust dtd May 22, 2002 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Baxter, Thomas Carl

Defendant

The Barbara Baxter Trust dtd May 22, 2002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KURTZ, DAVID R.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assests To Transfer Real Property to Trust; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing (PR) heard 08/07/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Order - Other (on Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets(To Transfer Real Property to Trust)) filed by Baxter, Thomas Carl on 08/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Baxter, Thomas Carl on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Miscellaneous Hearing (PR) - Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assests To Transfer Real Property to Trust scheduled for 08/07/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Petition - Other (Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assests To Transfer Real Property to Trust) filed by Baxter, Thomas Carl on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Baxter, Thomas Carl(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less