This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 07:06:05 (UTC).

In re: Ramona Lerma Living Trust, Dated May 12, 2003

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 In re Ramona Lerma Living Trust, Dated May 12, 2003 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lerma, Rose Mary

Defendant

Ramona Lerma Living Trust, Dated May 12, 2003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BAYLEY, GUY R

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Description: Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust, Confirm Trustee, and Confirm Assets to Revocable...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketOrder - Other (on Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust, Confirm Trustee, and Confirm Assets to Revocable Trust) filed by Lerma, Rose Mary on 02/16/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition Other (PR) heard 02/16/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (for 02.16.22) filed by Lerma, Rose Mary on 02/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Description: Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust, Confirm Trustee, and Confirm Assets to Revocable...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition Other (PR) heard 01/12/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPetition Other (PR) - Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust, Confirm Trustee, and Confirm Assets to Revocable Trust scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (01/12/22) filed by Lerma, Rose Mary on 12/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketPetition Other (PR) - Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust, Confirm Trustee, and Confirm Assets to Revocable Trust scheduled for 01/12/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketPetition - Other (for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust, Confirm Trustee, and Confirm Assets to Revocable Trust) filed by Lerma, Rose Mary on 12/08/2021. Filed By: Lerma, Rose Mary(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD