This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 17:26:14 (UTC).

In Re Estate of Raymond Louis Kennedy

Case Summary

On 08/21/2014 In Re Estate of Raymond Louis Kennedy was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITADEL STORAGE, LLC

T.O.P.S. Ltd

Defendants and Petitioners

Kennedy, Jean Rae

Lim, Lisa

Kennedy, Linda Mae

Decedent

Kennedy, Raymond Louis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLROD, ANTHONY J

Petitioner Attorneys

Monroe, Jennifer

Camarena, Timothy S.

Defendant Attorney

Schaerer, Enrique R

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition to Determine Ownership of Personal Property in Possession of Another. To Order Transfer of...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney (Former Timothy Camarena. Now in Pro Per) filed by Kennedy, Jean Rae on 06/29/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • 40.00 received for 211-Request for Special Notice on 05/14/2015 from .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • Request for Special Notice (Ferguson Case Orr Paterson LLP) filed by Lim, Lisa on 05/14/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney submitted by Kennedy, Linda Mae rejected on 04/20/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Request for Special Notice submitted by Camarena, Timothy S. rejected on 03/27/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • Order - Other (Deeming Service by Mail Upon Counsel of Lisa Lim as Sufficient Service) filed by Kennedy, Jean Rae on 10/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • 56-2014-00457019-CU-MC-VTA consolidated with lead case 56-2014-00456979-PR-OP-OXN on 10/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2014
  • The Court orders the following cases consolidated for all purposes: 2014-00457019-CU-MC-VTA CITADEL STORAGE, LLC vs. Lim. The Court designates 56-2014-00456979 Estate of Raymond Louis Kennedy as the lead case and all further documents must be filed under the case number and caption of the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Declaration to Response in Opposition to Petition by Decendent's Successor in Interest filed by Respondents.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney (Former Attorney Jennifer M Monroe;New Attorney Timothy Camarena) filed by Kennedy, Jean Rae on 10/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2014
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Response (in Opposition to Petition by Decedent's Successor in Interest) filed by KUVERA PARTNERS, HOLLYWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC on 09/26/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Amended (Notice of Related Case) filed by Kennedy, Jean Rae on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Supplement - Other (Supplement to Petition by Decedent's Successor etc...) filed by Kennedy, Jean Rae on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Kennedy, Jean Rae on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • Miscellaneous Hearing (PR) - Petition to Determine Ownership of Personal Property in Possession of Another. To Order Transfer of that property to Successor of Decedent. Request for Attorney Fees scheduled for 10/15/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • Petition - Other (Determine Ownership of Personal Property in Possession of Another. To Order Transfer of that property to Successor of Decedent. Request for Attorney Fees) filed by Kennedy, Jean Rae on 08/21/2014. Filed By: Kennedy, Jean Rae(Petitioner) Refers To: Kennedy, Raymond(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.