This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 07:01:01 (UTC).

In Re Brett Yarmie 2010 Revocable Living Trust

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 In Re Brett Yarmie 2010 Revocable Living Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Riggio, Dino

Defendant

Brett Yarmie 2010 Revocable Living Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Malin, Garry S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Description: for Instruction and Information and Accounting; Attorney's Fees and Costs; and Damages; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court's Motion (PR); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 12:10 PM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docket56-2021-00556408-PR-TR-OXN consolidated with lead case 56-2021-00556369-PR-TR-OXN on 09/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Description: for Instruction and Information and Accounting; Attorney's Fees and Costs; and Damages; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (of Hearing on Petitions for Instructions and Construction Under Probate Code... to 09.15.221) filed by Riggio, Dino on 08/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPetition Other (PR) - for Instruction and Information and Accounting; Attorney's Fees and Costs; and Damages scheduled for 09/15/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketFax Request for Continuance and Order (GRANTED) filed by Riggio, Dino on 08/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (09/01/21) filed by Riggio, Dino on 07/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketPetition Other (PR) - for Instruction and Information and Accounting; Attorney's Fees and Costs; and Damages scheduled for 09/01/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPetition - Other (for Instruction and Information and Accounting; Attorney's Fees and Costs; and Damages) filed by Riggio, Dino on 07/21/2021. Filed By: Riggio, Dino(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malin, Garry S