This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 11:00:11 (UTC).

Ideal Security and Technology LLC vs. Shaffiq Rahim

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Ideal Security and Technology LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Shaffiq Rahim. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ideal Security and Technology LLC

Defendant

Rahim, Shaffiq

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michie, Douglas C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Doug Michie RE Pre-Judgment Interest and Attorney's Fees on Default on Action on contract) filed by Ideal Security and Technology LLC on 01/11/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Ideal Security and Technology LLC rejected on 12/16/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Ideal Security and Technology LLC rejected on 12/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Rahim, Shaffiq on Complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Ideal Security and Technology LLC on 12/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ideal Security and Technology LLC on 12/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/15/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ideal Security and Technology LLC on 10/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ideal Security and Technology LLC on 10/27/2022. Filed By: Ideal Security and Technology LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Rahim, Shaffiq(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less