This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 12:07:26 (UTC).

Howard Brashear vs. Amcord Inc

Case Summary

On 07/23/2012 Howard Brashear filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Amcord Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brashear, Howard

Brashear, Marjorie

Defendants

Amcord Inc

Asbestos Corporation LTD

Beazer East Inc individually and as successor in interest to Koppers Company

Bell Industries Inc

BorgWarner Morse TEC Inc as successor by merger to Borg Warner Corporation

Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc

CSK Auto Inc

CSR LTD

CalPortland Company

Certainteed Corporation

Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc

Dana Companies LLC

Dana Corporation

Davis Water and Waste Industries Inc

Dowman Products Inc

Familian Corporation

Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as Successor to Felt Products Manufacturing Compan

Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as sucessor to Felt Products

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHBACK, STEPHEN M.

Defendant Attorneys

GOLDBERG, A. SCOTT

POND, FRANK D.

MITCHEL, STEVEN M.

KANNETT, MARK S

BERKES, ROBERT H

OLSON, DEAN A.

Arthur, David G

Agelson, Karen P

Rasmussen, Jennifer C

Brady, Matthew S

Other Attorneys

LANNUS, PAUL

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Pieper, Timothy C

Duffy, Joseph

McMahon, Brien F

ASIANO, ANN M. ESQ

L, Prieto Jennifer

GILEFSKY, JUDD A

Milbrodt, Jeremy D

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 2:00 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 2:00 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 11:21 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 3:34 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Further Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Further Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 2:00 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 11:07 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:57 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 2:00 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 2:00 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 1:52 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
1,520 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2012
  • Certainteed Corporation added as a Defendant effective 07/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Calportland Company added as a Defendant effective 07/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc added as a Defendant effective 07/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Bell Industries Inc added as a Defendant effective 07/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Beazer East Inc individually and as successor in interest to Koppers Company added as a Defendant effective 07/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Asbestos Corporation LTD added as a Defendant effective 07/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 44.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brashear, Howard; Brashear, Marjorie on 07/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Brashear, Howard; Brashear, Marjorie on 07/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Complaint filed by Brashear, Howard; Brashear, Marjorie on 07/23/2012. Filed By: Brashear, Howard(Plaintiff) | Brashear, Marjorie(Plaintiff) Refers To: Water Applications Distribution Company Inc individually and as Successor in Interest to U.S. Filter Distribution Group Inc. Taylor Jett Co and Davis Water and Waste Industries Inc(Defendant) | The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California(Defendant) | Parsons Government Services Inc(Defendant) | BorgWarner Morse TEC Inc as successor by merger to Borg Warner Corporation(Defendant) | John K Bice Co Inc(Defendant) | Georgia Pacific LLC(Defendant) | Grinnell LLC(Defendant) | Honeywell International Inc(Defendant) | Dana Companies LLC(Defendant) | Pneumo Abex LLC(Defendant) | Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as Successor to Felt Products Manufacturing Company(Defendant) | Water Applications Distribution Group Inc and as Successor In Interest to U S Filter Distribution Group Inc(Defendant) | Davis Water and Waste Industries Inc(Defendant) | CalPortland Company(Defendant) | Amcord Inc(Defendant) | Asbestos Corporation LTD(Defendant) | Beazer East Inc individually and as successor in interest to Koppers Company(Defendant) | Bell Industries Inc(Defendant) | Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc(Defendant) | Calportland Company(Defendant) | Certainteed Corporation(Defendant) | Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc(Defendant) | CSK Auto Inc(Defendant) | CSR LTD(Defendant) | Dana Corporation(Defendant) | Dowman Products Inc(Defendant) | Familian Corporation(Defendant) | Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as sucessor to Felt Products(Defendant) | Ford Motor Company(Defendant) | Foseco Metallurgical Inc(Defendant) | Genuine Parts Company(Defendant) | Georgia Pacific Corporation(Defendant) | Grinnel Corporation(Defendant) | Hanson Permanente Cement Inc(Defendant) | Hill Brothers Chemical Company(Defendant) | Honeywell International Inc(Defendant) | Inductotherm Corporation(Defendant) | Ingersoll Rand Company(Defendant) | JM Manufacturing Company Inc(Defendant) | John K Bice Company Inc(Defendant) | Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc(Defendant) | Keenan Properties Inc(Defendant) | Metalclad Insulation Corporation(Defendant) | MS2G Inc(Defendant) | National Automotive Parts Association(Defendant) | Owens Illinios Inc(Defendant) | Parex USA Inc(Defendant) | Parkerhannifin Corporation individually and as successor in interest to EIS Brake Parts(Defendant) | Parsons Infrastructure & Technology Group Inc(Defendant) | Pneumo Abex Corporation(Defendant) | Rapid American Corporation(Defendant) | Sears Roebuck and Company(Defendant) | Sepco Corporation(Defendant) | Slakey Brothers Inc(Defendant) | Soco West Inc(Defendant) | Special Electric Company Inc(Defendant) | The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(Defendant) | The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Rubber Company(Defendant) | Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc(Defendant) | Union Carbide Corporation(Defendant) | US Filter Distribution Group Inc(Defendant) | Westburne Supply Inc(Defendant) | Western Waterworkd Supply Company(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less