This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 08:16:44 (UTC).

Holly Cordan vs. Costco Wholesale

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Holly Cordan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Costco Wholesale. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cordan, Holly

Defendants

Costco Wholesale

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bernstein, Barry S

Defendant Attorneys

MIRETSKY, MICHAEL

Sewell, Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (Case 2:20-cv-11096 Filed 12-07-20) filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation on 12/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by Cordan, Holly on 09/18/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCostco Wholesale Corporation added as a Defendant effective 09/18/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation on 09/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Publication (Served Gabriela Sanchez CT Corp) filed by Cordan, Holly on 08/27/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/26/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cordan, Holly on 08/05/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cordan, Holly on 08/05/2020. Filed By: Cordan, Holly(Plaintiff) Refers To: Costco Wholesale(Defendant) | Costco Wholesale Corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIRETSKY MICHAEL