This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/24/2020 at 05:03:59 (UTC).

Hollow Hills Greens HOA vs Dauer

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Hollow Hills Greens HOA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dauer. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hollow Hills Greens Homeowners Association South Inc

Defendant

Dauer, Kelly A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunter, Scott A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Dauer, Kelly A on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Hollow Hills Greens Homeowners Association South Inc on 11/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Date of Service: 10/01/2020. Cost 0.0) filed by Hollow Hills Greens Homeowners Association South Inc on 10/05/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hollow Hills Greens Homeowners Association South Inc on 09/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hollow Hills Greens Homeowners Association South Inc on 09/24/2020. Filed By: Hollow Hills Greens Homeowners Association South Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Dauer, Kelly(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less